THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:11:30 AM
Feldmann, Joseph
CPSO#:
23973
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Oct 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 St. Clair Avenue East
Suite 606
Toronto ON M4T 2V7
Phone: 416 489 2619
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Joseph Feldmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 27 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH FELDMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMANN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2023 |