skip to content

Feigenberg, Tomer

CPSO#: 93915

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Obstetrics
& Gynecology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 1841 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tomer Feigenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Feigenberg ( CPSO# 93915 )
Dr. M. Inbar-Feigenberg ( CPSO# 95141 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:27 Oct 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jul 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Gynecologic Oncology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Oct 2013
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020 Active
             1.    Dr. Tomer Feigenberg may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Obstetrics   and  Gynecology,  Division  of  Gynecologic  Oncology,
                        University of  Toronto,  in  which Dr. Feigenberg holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  when  Dr.  Feigenberg   no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.