THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 17:15:06 PM
Feigenberg, Tomer
CPSO#:
93915
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Obstetrics
& Gynecology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 1841
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:27 Oct 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jul 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Oct 2013
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
|
Active |