skip to content

Fazlani, Mushtaq Ahmed

CPSO#: 23612

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 31 Dec 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 31 Dec 1984

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Nov 1986
Summary:

 In November 1986, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Mushtaq Ahmed Fazlani guilty of professional 
 misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed 
 sexual impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that the doctor's licence 
 be suspended for a period of one year.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 12 Nov 1986