THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:04:40 AM
Fazlani, Mushtaq Ahmed
CPSO#:
23612
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
31 Dec 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of the Punjab, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1966 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Sep 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1984 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Nov 1986
Summary:
In November 1986, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Mushtaq Ahmed Fazlani guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. Consequently, the Committee ordered that the doctor's licence be suspended for a period of one year.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 12 Nov 1986