skip to content

Ardeshiri, Farnaz

CPSO#: 82835

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: F. Ardeshiri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ardeshiri ( CPSO# 82835 )

Business Address:
311-7191 Yonge St
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4

Business Address:
Suite 311
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Phone Number: (905) 597-1051

 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
RSRS
Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Press 1, 1, then 1 again
Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 26 Aug 2023

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:06 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARNAZ ARDESHIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARDESHIRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2007