THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:21:12 AM
Ardeshiri, Farnaz
CPSO#:
82835
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Press 1, 1, then 1 again
Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 26 Aug 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FARNAZ ARDESHIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARDESHIRI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2007 |