skip to content

Farhadi, Elham

CPSO#: 85343

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shiraz University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 Terminal Ave
Ottawa ON  K1G0Z3
Phone: (613) 7312244
Fax: 6132604802 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2127
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

501 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1H8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 7378733
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elham Farhadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Farhadi ( CPSO# 85343 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Special Care Nursery
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4418

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Mother-Baby
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
8th East
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8733

Business Address:
Unit B 24
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone Number: (613) 731-2244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:21 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELHAM FARHADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 07 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
AVP - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 19 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 21 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011