THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:36:03 AM
Farhadi, Elham
CPSO#:
85343
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Shiraz University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
550 Terminal Ave
Ottawa ON K1G0Z3
Phone: (613) 7312244
Fax: 6132604802
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:21 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELHAM FARHADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHADI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 07 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
AVP - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 19 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 21 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2011 |