skip to content

Farag, Naguib Nader Naguib

CPSO#: 94656

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Sep 2024
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Sep 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pembroke Regional Hospital
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:02 Sep 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Feb 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Feb 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 04 Feb 2014
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2021 Active
 1. Dr. NAGUIB NADER NAGUIB FARAG may practise anesthesiology at Pembroke Regional Hospital in Pembroke, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. FARAG's eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.
 
3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. FARAG's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. FARAG's practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 02 September, 2021, and will expire on or before 01 September, 2024, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.