THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:44:33 PM
Farag, Naguib Nader Naguib
CPSO#:
94656
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:02 Sep 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Feb 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Feb 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 04 Feb 2014
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2021 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2021 |
|
Active |