skip to content

Evoy, Andrea

CPSO#: 86951

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4048 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Evoy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Evoy ( CPSO# 86951 )

Business Address:
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA EVOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009