THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:03:56 PM
Evoy, Andrea
CPSO#:
86951
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4048
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA EVOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVOY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |