skip to content

Erendzhinova, Ekaterina

CPSO#: 87720

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Omskij Ordena Trudovofo Krasnogo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E. Erendzhinova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 220 1929 Russell Road Ottawa, ON K1G 4G3
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
EL - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2009 to 21 Aug 2009
EL - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 14 Jun 2010 to 25 Jun 2010
EL - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014