THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:16:56 PM
Erendzhinova, Ekaterina
CPSO#:
87720
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Omskij Ordena Trudovofo Krasnogo, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: E. Erendzhinova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite 220
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa, ON K1G 4G3
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
EL - Paediatric Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2009 to 21 Aug 2009
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 14 Jun 2010 to 25 Jun 2010
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2014 |