skip to content

Emmerton-Coughlin, Heather Margaret Anne

CPSO#: 91447

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:25 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Western University, 15 Aug 2014 to 25 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Western University, 26 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Western University, 26 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2017