THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:02:56 AM
Emmerton-Coughlin, Heather Margaret Anne
CPSO#:
91447
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:25 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2014 to 25 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2017 |