skip to content

Eltriki, Abdulslam Mostafa

CPSO#: 85822

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2006 to 18 Jan 2007
PEAP - R - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 21 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Apr 2009 to 21 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2013 to 31 May 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Sep 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Sep 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2015