THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:02:20 PM
Eltriki, Abdulslam Mostafa
CPSO#:
85822
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Nov 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2006 to 18 Jan 2007
PEAP - R - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 21 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Apr 2009 to 21 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2013 to 31 May 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Sep 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Sep 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2015 |