skip to content

Elltoft, John David

CPSO#: 20968

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 May 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 May 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3456 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2J 2K4
Phone: 289 296 6606
Fax: 289 296 6605 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John David Elltoft Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Elltoft ( CPSO# 20968 )

Business Address:
3456 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2J 2K4
Phone Number: (289) 296-6606

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Feb 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010 Active
             Dr.  John David Elltoft may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.