THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:59:06 PM
Elltoft, John David
CPSO#:
20968
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 May 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
209 Glenridge Ave
Glenridge Walk in Clinic
St Catharines ON L2T 3J6
Phone: 2893625333
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1967 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 17 Dec 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 May 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 05 Feb 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2010 |
|
Active |