skip to content

Elashaal, Abdurrahim Abdalla

CPSO#: 87504

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: 5199734690 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leamington District memorial Hospit
Neurosurgery
194 Talbot street West
Leamington
Leamington ON  N9H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Suite 104
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-8771
Fax: (519) 973-4690
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Abdurrahim Elashaal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elashaal ( CPSO# 87504 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 973-8771

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:05 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABDURRAHIM ABDALLA ELASHAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELASHAAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2012