THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:09:05 PM
Elashaal, Abdurrahim Abdalla
CPSO#:
87504
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: 5199734690
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:05 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDURRAHIM ABDALLA ELASHAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELASHAAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 2012 |