skip to content

Elahi, Ayesha Attia

CPSO#: 95313

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pashto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsbridge Medical Centre
Suite 111
33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga, ON
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone: (905) 507-1111
Fax: (905) 890-7102 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ayesha A. Elahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elahi ( CPSO# 95313 )

Business Address:
Suite 111
33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone Number: (905) 507-1111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AYESHA ATTIA ELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014