THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:59:38 PM
Elahi, Ayesha Attia
CPSO#:
95313
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pashto, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingsbridge Medical Centre
Suite 111
33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga, ON
Mississauga ON L5B 2N5
Phone: (905) 507-1111
Fax: (905) 890-7102
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AYESHA ATTIA ELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2014 |