skip to content

El-Assar, Dalia Shaban Dawoud

CPSO#: 97647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: 5198049234 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: El-Assar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. El-Assar ( CPSO# 97647 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Business Address:
100 The Board Walk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B1
Phone Number: (519) 279-4098

Business Address:
Suite 203
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 2L3

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DALIA SHABAN DAWOUD EL-ASSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-ASSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Western University, 15 Dec 2015 to 04 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2016