THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:53:59 AM
El-Assar, Dalia Shaban Dawoud
CPSO#:
97647
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
Phone: 519-804-9050
Fax: 519-804-9046
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DALIA SHABAN DAWOUD EL-ASSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-ASSAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Dec 2015 to 04 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2016 |