skip to content

ElAlfy, Ahmed Mahmoud Ibrahim

CPSO#: 85434

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

1245 LAKESHORE ROAD
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
Phone: 905-632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

3305 HARVESTER ROAD
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Canada
Phone: 905-388-9505
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: AME ElAlfy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. ElAlfy ( CPSO# 85434 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:31 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMED MAHMOUD IBRAHIM ELALFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELALFY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
AVP - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2010