THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:35:48 PM
ElAlfy, Ahmed Mahmoud Ibrahim
CPSO#:
85434
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Jul 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AHMED MAHMOUD IBRAHIM ELALFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELALFY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2010 |