skip to content

El Zuway, Salem A Ali

CPSO#: 85553

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300
State Street
ERIE PA  16506
United States
Phone: 8148775330

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Salem El Zuway Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 5 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:05 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SALEM A ALI EL ZUWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL ZUWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 15 Sep 2006 to 03 Nov 2006
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 05 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2007 to 05 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2008 to 05 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2009 to 05 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2010 to 05 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2011 to 05 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 Aug 2013
CF - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 24 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2012