THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:24:41 PM
El Zuway, Salem A Ali
CPSO#:
85553
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Garyounis University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Salem El Zuway Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 5 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:05 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 15 Sep 2006 to 03 Nov 2006
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 04 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 05 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 06 Nov 2007 to 05 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 06 Nov 2008 to 05 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 06 Nov 2009 to 05 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 06 Nov 2010 to 05 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 06 Nov 2011 to 05 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 06 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 Aug 2013
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Aug 2021 |