skip to content

El Saidi, Mohammed Abdel Latif Mahmoud Mohammed

CPSO#: 86623

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 May 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road,
Suite 514,
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: 905-997-7107
Fax: 866-253-5553 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

New Jane Medical Centre,
911 Jane Street,
Toronto ON  M6N 4C6
Canada
Phone: 647-345-5855
Fax: 647-345-5057
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Niagara Health System,
1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohammed El Saidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. El Saidi ( CPSO# 86623 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Suite 514
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4

Business Address:
911A Jane Street
Toronto ON  M6N 4C6
Phone Number: (647) 345-5855


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:05 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDEL LATIF MAHMOUD MOHAMMED EL SAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL SAIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2010