THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:07:07 AM
El Saidi, Mohammed Abdel Latif Mahmoud Mohammed
CPSO#:
86623
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 May 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Tanta University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
512-2000 Credit Valley Rd
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Phone: 905-997-7107
Fax: 866-253-5553
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:05 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDEL LATIF MAHMOUD MOHAMMED EL SAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL SAIDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2010 |