Ejaz, Aiza (CPSO#: 93570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dermcare
Suite 303, 1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone: (905) 625-5600
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aiza Ejaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ejaz ( CPSO# 93570 )

Business Address:
1065 Canadian Place
Suite 303
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 625-5600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIZA EJAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EJAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2016