THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:34:37 AM
Ejaz, Aiza
CPSO#:
93570
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1435 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5G 3H5
Phone: 9056255600
Fax: 9056255650
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:31 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AIZA EJAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EJAZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2016 |