skip to content

Eipe, Naveen

CPSO#: 85562

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Dept of Anesthesiology
1053 Carling Avenue Room B310
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13680
Fax: (613) 761-5209 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

5 Hyde Park Way
Ottawa ON  K2G 5R8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naveen Eipe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Eipe ( CPSO# 85562 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hosptial - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B310
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 06 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 07 Oct 2006 to 30 Aug 2007
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Oct 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016 Active
             Dr. Naveen Eipe may practise medicine independently in anaesthesiology.