THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:56:06 PM
Eipe, Naveen
CPSO#:
85562
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Dept of Anesthesiology
1053 Carling Avenue Room B310
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13680
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Sep 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 06 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 07 Oct 2006 to 30 Aug 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 30 Oct 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Nov 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Nov 2016 |
|
Active |