skip to content

Ebeid, Manal William

CPSO#: 87391

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 150-A
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 493-0346
Fax: (416) 493-0336 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

101-3319 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K2
Canada
Phone: 4164912999
Fax: 4164910009
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Salib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salib ( CPSO# 83042 )
Dr. M. Ebeid ( CPSO# 87391 )

Business Address:
3319 - 3319 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1T 3K2
Phone Number: (416) 491-2999

Business Address:
197 - 5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 493-0346

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANAL WILLIAM EBEID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EBEID is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009