THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 6:54:53 AM
Ebeid, Manal William
CPSO#:
87391
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 150-A
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 493-0346
Fax: (416) 493-0336
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANAL WILLIAM EBEID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EBEID is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jul 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Nov 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Mar 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2009 |