skip to content

Ten Cate, Eileen Marietta

CPSO#: 104991

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King St W
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eileen M. Ten Cate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Grant ( CPSO# 20878 )
Dr. E. Ten Cate ( CPSO# 104991)

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
752 King St W
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: 613-544-4900


Corporation Name: Eileen M. Ten Cate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ten Cate ( CPSO# 104991)

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
752 King St W
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: 613-544-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EILEEN MARIETTA TEN CATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEN CATE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2016 to 01 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017