skip to content

Nancekievill, Elizabeth Anne

CPSO#: 59700

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 1989

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8
389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-8323 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Blanchard and Nancekievill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Blanchard ( CPSO# 57130 )
Dr. E. Nancekievill ( CPSO# 59700 )

Business Address:
8 - 389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-8323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE NANCEKIEVILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANCEKIEVILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Jul 1989
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1989