skip to content

Dymon, William Andrew

CPSO#: 21937

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres S Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 29 May 2017


Address: Record Storage and Retreival Services 111St Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y7 Phone: 416 398 0638 or 1 888 563 3732 Fax: 416 398 5932
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 16 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017