THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:44:04 PM
Dymon, William Andrew
CPSO#:
21937
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Record Storage and Retrieval Service (RSRS)
1-888-563-3732
111 St Regis Cres S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 29 May 2017
Instructions/Address:Contact above
Record Storage and Retreival Services
111St Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y7
Phone: 416 398 0638 or 1 888 563 3732 Fax: 416 398 5932
Date Received: 16 Jan 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1974 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1982 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |