skip to content

Dunlop, Peter Ewart

CPSO#: 19423

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record should contact: The Medical Records Department Haldimand War Memorial Hospital 206 John Street Dunnville, ON N1A 2P7
Date Received: 26 Jun 2012


Address: All other patients should contact the following: Joan Grant Office Manager Medical Arts Building 334 Broad Street West Dunnville, ON N1A 1T1 Tel: 905-774-7541
Instructions: Former patients of Dr. Dunlop who were under the care of Dr. Blake should contact Dr. Blake (#71529) to get a copy of their records.
Date Received: 10 Oct 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012