THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:51:37 PM
Dunlop, Peter Ewart
CPSO#:
19423
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Mar 1965
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking for a copy of their medical record should contact:
The Medical Records Department
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John Street
Dunnville, ON
N1A 2P7
Date Received: 26 Jun 2012
Instructions/Address:Former patients of Dr. Dunlop who were under the care of Dr. Blake should contact Dr. Blake (#71529) to get a copy of their records.
All other patients should contact the following:
Joan Grant
Office Manager
Medical Arts Building
334 Broad Street West
Dunnville, ON N1A 1T1
Tel: 905-774-7541
Date Received: 10 Oct 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1971 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |