skip to content

Doumouras, Aristithes Gerard

CPSO#: 97738

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Centre for Minimal Access Surgery
Rm T2140
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35148
Fax: 905-540-6583 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

726 Upper James St
GHA Surgical Centre
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 9055755743
Fax: 9055757711
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Doumouras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Doumouras ( CPSO# 97738 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Ave E
Room F314
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARISTITHES GERARD DOUMOURAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUMOURAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018