THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:43:15 PM
Doumouras, Aristithes Gerard
CPSO#:
97738
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Centre for Minimal Access Surgery
Rm T2140
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35148
Fax: 905-540-6583
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARISTITHES GERARD DOUMOURAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUMOURAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |