skip to content

Dool, Jayson Sidney

CPSO#: 94578

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2012
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jayson S. Dool Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 667 Champlain Street Dieppe, New Brunswick E1A 1P6
Date Received: 15 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:11 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2012