THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/03/24 4:05:47 AM
Dool, Jayson Sidney
CPSO#:
94578
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jayson S. Dool Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2012
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
667 Champlain Street
Dieppe, New Brunswick
E1A 1P6
Date Received: 15 May 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:11 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Oct 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2012 |