Dicu, Armela Ovidia (CPSO#: 100029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King St West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-748-6976
Fax: 519-749-4378
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 03 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARMELA OVIDIA DICU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 26 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 13 May 2013 to 31 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015